TN SB2672 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state board of education to promulgate emergency rules as necessary to address any issues created by school closures due to the outbreak of COVID-19 during the 2019-2020 school year; requires the commissioner of education to waive certain requirements; establishes other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state board of education to promulgate emergency rules as necessary to address any issues created by school closures due to the outbreak of COVID-19 during the 2019-2020 school year; requires the commissioner of education to waive certain requirements; establishes other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 652 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Education Comm. 3/18/20 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2818 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 652