TN SB2715 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the fiscal review committee must be allowed to review noncompetitive procurement agreements; requires the chief procurement officer to report procurement contracts monthly to the fiscal review committee; revises various other provisions related to procurement of state contracts. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the fiscal review committee must be allowed to review noncompetitive procurement agreements; requires the chief procurement officer to report procurement contracts monthly to the fiscal review committee; revises various other provisions related to procurement of state contracts. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2727 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration