TN SB2736 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, expands eligibility to vote in city elections to include persons that may vote for members of the general assembly in Lincoln County; reduces the number of times an ordinance must be approved by the legislative body to be effective from three to two. - Amends Chapter 801 of the Private Acts of 1949.
Title
Subject to local approval, expands eligibility to vote in city elections to include persons that may vote for members of the general assembly in Lincoln County; reduces the number of times an ordinance must be approved by the legislative body to be effective from three to two. - Amends Chapter 801 of the Private Acts of 1949.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 54 | |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2703 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 54