TN SB2756 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enhances requirements for public access to certain public records of governmental entities. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, enhances requirements for public access to certain public records of governmental entities. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2132 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee