TN SB2765 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces from 21 to 14 days the period within which the governing body of the Tennessee Professional Firefighters Association may submit to the governor a list of nominees to fill a vacancy on the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education following notice of a vacancy or pending vacancy, or written objection by the governor to a previously submitted list of nominees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces from 21 to 14 days the period within which the governing body of the Tennessee Professional Firefighters Association may submit to the governor a list of nominees to fill a vacancy on the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education following notice of a vacancy or pending vacancy, or written objection by the governor to a previously submitted list of nominees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2683 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback