TN SB2832 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirements that were enacted in 2019 for person or organization that has not been designated by the county election commission to conduct supplemental voter registration drives that attempts to register 100 or more people to vote. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 19 and Title 2, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, removes requirements that were enacted in 2019 for person or organization that has not been designated by the county election commission to conduct supplemental voter registration drives that attempts to register 100 or more people to vote. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 19 and Title 2, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2435 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee