TN SB2849 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a person from preparing or issuing a certificate of property or casualty insurance coverage that contains false or misleading information regarding the underlying insurance policy and limits the uses of certificates of insurance. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a person from preparing or issuing a certificate of property or casualty insurance coverage that contains false or misleading information regarding the underlying insurance policy and limits the uses of certificates of insurance. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 608 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2020, 07/01/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0556) |
2020-03-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0537) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2161 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 608