TN SB2874 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes the Tennessee equine health advisory commission. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 43.
Title
As enacted, establishes the Tennessee equine health advisory commission. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 43.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 808 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0904) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0903) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0904) |
2020-06-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0903) |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2639 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 808