TN SB2887 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from February 1 to January 15 the date by which the Tennessee bureau of investigation is required to provide an annual report to the judiciary committees of the senate and house of representatives on the amount of money collected from gun dealers to perform background checks that are in excess of the costs to the bureau to perform the checks. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Section 50-3-201; Section 58-1-112; Section 70-4-123 and Section 70-5-101.
Title
As introduced, changes from February 1 to January 15 the date by which the Tennessee bureau of investigation is required to provide an annual report to the judiciary committees of the senate and house of representatives on the amount of money collected from gun dealers to perform background checks that are in excess of the costs to the bureau to perform the checks. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Section 50-3-201; Section 58-1-112; Section 70-4-123 and Section 70-5-101.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2298 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee