TN SB2896 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Parental Oversight of Public Libraries Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 10.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Parental Oversight of Public Libraries Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 10.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2721 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/11/2020