TN SB2904 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes county boards of education, by agreement with city and special school districts, to allow students from such districts to access the county board's cooperative innovative high school program, if the city or special school districts have not established such program. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, authorizes county boards of education, by agreement with city and special school districts, to allow students from such districts to access the county board's cooperative innovative high school program, if the city or special school districts have not established such program. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3231 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2904&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2904.pdf |