TN SB8011 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the notice of a potential claim for healthcare liability that is based on alleged exposure to or contraction of coronavirus include the date and location of the alleged exposure or contraction. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 28; Title 29 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires that the notice of a potential claim for healthcare liability that is based on alleged exposure to or contraction of coronavirus include the date and location of the alleged exposure or contraction. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 28; Title 29 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/11/2020 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 8-11-20 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |