TN SJR0035 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes pornography as a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes pornography as a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: recommend for adoption, refer to Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-04-19SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-04-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-18SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-04-18SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-04-17HouseConcurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1
2017-04-13HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
2017-04-04HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-09HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseRef. to Health Committee
2017-03-06SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-06SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-03-06SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2017-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/6/2017
2017-03-01SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2017-02-22SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/1/2017
2017-02-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/1/2017
2017-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/22/2017
2017-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback