TN SJR0053 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the National Suicide Hotline Improvement Act of 2018 and the creation of a three-digit nationwide suicide and mental health crisis hotline in the United States.
Title
Expresses support for the National Suicide Hotline Improvement Act of 2018 and the creation of a three-digit nationwide suicide and mental health crisis hotline in the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to Health Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |