TN SJR0113 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Requests State Capitol Commission to initiate creation and placement in State Capitol of bust to honor Admiral William Porter Lawrence.
Title
Requests State Capitol Commission to initiate creation and placement in State Capitol of bust to honor Admiral William Porter Lawrence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |