TN SJR0227 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Secretary of State to include the Appalachian dialect in Section VI of the Tennessee Blue Book.
Title
Urges Secretary of State to include the Appalachian dialect in Section VI of the Tennessee Blue Book.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-14 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |