TN SJR0352 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Pending: House Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Pending: House Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Williams Syndrome Awareness Month," May 2019
Title
"Williams Syndrome Awareness Month," May 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 4/10/19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |