TN SJR0403 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
University of Tennessee Volunteers men's basketball team
Title
University of Tennessee Volunteers men's basketball team
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-04 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |