TN SJR0514 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senator Rosalind Kurita
Title
Senator Rosalind Kurita
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-17 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |