TN SJR0645 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the deregulation of the glider manufacturing industry in this state.
Title
Expresses support for the deregulation of the glider manufacturing industry in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0645&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SJR0645.pdf |