TN SJR0686 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

John Crosslin, Board of Directors of the Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

John Crosslin, Board of Directors of the Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-02-13SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-02-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-02-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-02-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-02-10HouseConcurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-02-06SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-02-06SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2020-02-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/6/2020
2020-02-04SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/4/2020
2020-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback