TN SJR0697 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Johnny Stites, Board of Trustees of Tennessee Technological University
Title
Johnny Stites, Board of Trustees of Tennessee Technological University
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-19 | House | Concurred, Ayes 82, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |