TN SJR1030 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supports independent entrepreneurs and opposes efforts to interfere with private business agreements, including independent contractors, through ABC tests and state or federal policies that stifle workers' choice.
Title
Supports independent entrepreneurs and opposes efforts to interfere with private business agreements, including independent contractors, through ABC tests and state or federal policies that stifle workers' choice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |