TN SJR1099 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
National Vietnam War Veterans Commemoration Day, March 29, 2020
Title
National Vietnam War Veterans Commemoration Day, March 29, 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR1099&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SJR1099.pdf |