TN SJR1345 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-12 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-12 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Betty Dickson Lomax Byrd
Title
Betty Dickson Lomax Byrd
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-10 | House | Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-09 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 6/10/20 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |