TN SR0018 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the Nation of Israel.
Title
Expresses support for the Nation of Israel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SR0018&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SR0018.pdf |