TN SR0019 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses disagreement and displeasure with TVA's decision to retire Bull Run Fossil Plant in Anderson County.
Title
Expresses disagreement and displeasure with TVA's decision to retire Bull Run Fossil Plant in Anderson County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |