TN SR0095 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the deregulation of the glider manufacturing industry in this state.
Title
Expresses support for the deregulation of the glider manufacturing industry in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0523) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |