TN SR0160 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sonya Renea Grant
Title
Sonya Renea Grant
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |