TN SR0164 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Office of the Chief Clerk of the Senate of the 111th General Assembly
Title
Office of the Chief Clerk of the Senate of the 111th General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |