TX HB101 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of false caller identification information display.
Title
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of false caller identification information display.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D] | Rep. William Zedler [R] |
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#121 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#121 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-02 | House | Record vote RV#121 |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-01 | House | Amended 1-Toth |
2019-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |