TX HB1021 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition on the imposition of court costs and filing or other fees on certain indigent defendants and plaintiffs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition on the imposition of court costs and filing or other fees on certain indigent defendants and plaintiffs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback