TX HB1038 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a petition by residents of certain counties for an election regarding voter approval of municipal annexation.
Title
Relating to a petition by residents of certain counties for an election regarding voter approval of municipal annexation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#604 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#559 (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#559 (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#604 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#559 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB404 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized