TX HB1047 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authority of certain officers of certain counties to disburse or direct payment of county funds for salaries or expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authority of certain officers of certain counties to disburse or direct payment of county funds for salaries or expenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB354 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback