TX HB107 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dissemination of criminal history record information by the Department of Public Safety concerning certain intoxication criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the dissemination of criminal history record information by the Department of Public Safety concerning certain intoxication criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-03 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIMINAL RECORDS
INTERNET
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
INTERNET
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB107 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00107I.htm |