TX HB1071 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an advance directive and do-not-resuscitate order of a pregnant woman and information provided for an advance directive.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an advance directive and do-not-resuscitate order of a pregnant woman and information provided for an advance directive.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback