TX HB1075 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the frequency of criminal background checks for sports officials registered with the University Interscholastic League.
Title
Relating to the frequency of criminal background checks for sports officials registered with the University Interscholastic League.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#949 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#949 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
SPORTS OFFICIALS
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
SPORTS OFFICIALS
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE