TX HB1078 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to waiving certain driver's license and handgun license fees for certain applicants who hold a certification in cardiopulmonary resuscitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to waiving certain driver's license and handgun license fees for certain applicants who hold a certification in cardiopulmonary resuscitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1831 (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#526 (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 2nd time RV#506 (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1831
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-30SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-30SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#526
2019-04-18HousePassed
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#506
2019-04-17HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1078
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01078I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01078H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01078E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01078S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01078F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1078&RcdVtNo=506&Ch=H&Dt=04/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1078&RcdVtNo=526&Ch=H&Dt=04/18/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1078&RcdVtNo=1831&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=74

Bill Comments

feedback