TX HB1080 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.
Title
Relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB732 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
BOARD OF PHYSICAL THERAPY EXAMINERS, TEXAS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PHYSICAL THERAPISTS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PHYSICAL THERAPISTS