TX HB1089 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the classification of certain entities as primarily engaged in retail trade for purposes of the franchise tax.
Title
Relating to the classification of certain entities as primarily engaged in retail trade for purposes of the franchise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#606 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#606 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed |