TX HB1095 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the imposition of certain criminal history record information requirements regarding the licensing of massage therapy.
Title
Relating to the imposition of certain criminal history record information requirements regarding the licensing of massage therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF