TX HB1109 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to waiving certain minimum standards for substitute care providers for children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to waiving certain minimum standards for substitute care providers for children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Mike Lang [R] | Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] |
Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Parent & Child
FOSTER CARE
Human Services
Human Services--General
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Parent & Child
FOSTER CARE
Human Services
Human Services--General