TX HB1125 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to factors the Texas Historical Commission considers in reviewing an application for a grant or loan through the historic courthouse preservation program.
Title
Relating to factors the Texas Historical Commission considers in reviewing an application for a grant or loan through the historic courthouse preservation program.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Companion considered in lieu of in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB496 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
COUNTY COURTHOUSES
County Government
County Government--Finance
Courts
Courts--General
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
City Government--Finance
COUNTY COURTHOUSES
County Government
County Government--Finance
Courts
Courts--General
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1125 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01125I.htm |