TX HB114 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing public high school students information regarding the availability of college credit awarded for military experience, education, and training obtained during military service.
Title
Relating to providing public high school students information regarding the availability of college credit awarded for military experience, education, and training obtained during military service.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Alex Dominguez [D] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] |
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#221 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#221 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#221 |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Military & Veterans
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Military & Veterans
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS