TX HB1182 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to personal financial literacy courses for high school students in public schools.
Title
Relating to personal financial literacy courses for high school students in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#412 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#412 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 2-Cain, Bucy, Talarico, and Goodwin |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 1-Allison |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB686 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Financial
Financial--General
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Financial
Financial--General