TX HB1188 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to Property Tax
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to Property Tax
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appraisal of land for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land following a transfer between family members.
Title
Relating to the appraisal of land for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land following a transfer between family members.
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] |
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Keith Bell [R] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] |
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Mike Lang [R] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#256 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#256 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
OPEN-SPACE LAND
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
OPEN-SPACE LAND
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions