TX HB12 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to early childhood intervention and rehabilitative and habilitative services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to early childhood intervention and rehabilitative and habilitative services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1037 (Y: 132 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1037
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-06HouseAmended 1-Miller
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2225 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback