TX HB1206 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and penalties for possession of marihuana.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and penalties for possession of marihuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA