TX HB1211 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the acquisition of, and the construction of improvements to, real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the acquisition of, and the construction of improvements to, real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#694 (Y: 121 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#694
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback