TX HB1214 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the allocation to and use by the Parks and Wildlife Department and Texas Historical Commission of certain proceeds from the imposition of state sales and use taxes on sporting goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the allocation to and use by the Parks and Wildlife Department and Texas Historical Commission of certain proceeds from the imposition of state sales and use taxes on sporting goods.

Sponsors

Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]
Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]
Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]
Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Eric Johnson [D]
Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]
Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]
Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]
Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]
Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Candy Noble [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. John Turner [D]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2019-04-23HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 26
2019-04-17HousePostponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR39 (Enabling for) 2019-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
SB526 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Co-author authorized
SB26 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Reported enrolled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback